Title
BOARDS, COMMISSIONS & OTHER BODIES
Staff Contact: Brent Stoddard, Director, Intergovernmental Programs
Purpose and Recommended Action
Recommendation
This is a request for City Council to approve the recommended appointments to the following boards, commissions and other bodies that have a vacancy or expired term and for the Mayor to administer the Oath of Office to those appointees in attendance.
Aviation Advisory Commission
Linda Yaeger Sahuaro Appointment 01/27/2015 11/24/2016
Walter Chaney - Vice Chair Barrel Appointment 01/27/2015 11/24/2015
Citizens Transportation Oversight Commission
Darrin Lacey Sahuaro Appointment 01/27/2015 03/25/2015
Community Development Advisory Committee
Mickey Nunez Ocotillo Appointment 01/27/2015 04/01/2016
General Plan Steering Committee
Darrin Lacey Sahuaro Appointment 01/27/2015 01/01/2016
Rick Harper Sahuaro Appointment 01/27/2015 01/01/2016
Historic Preservation Commission
Larry Rovey Mayoral Appointment 01/27/2015 04/13/2016
Industrial Development Authority
Robert Holmes Cholla Reappointment 01/27/2015 08/23/2020
Judicial Selection Advisory Board
Randall Warner - Chair Presiding Judge Appointment 01/27/2015 11/29/2015
Of Superior Court
Christina Rubalcava-Vice Chair Cholla Appointment 01/27/2015 11/29/2015
Library Advisory Board
Andre Xavier Grajeda - Teen Mayoral Appointment 01/27/2015 05/27/2015
Parks & Recreation Advisory Commission
Jerri Ann Soper - Teen Mayoral Appointment 01/27/2015 05/27/2015
Personnel Board
Davita Solter Sahuaro Appointment 01/27/2014 12/22/2016
Planning Commission
Rick Harper Sahuaro Appointment 01/27/2015 03/25/2016
Steve Johnston - Chair Cactus Appointment 01/27/2015 03/25/2015
Al Lenox - Vice Chair Barrel Appointment 01/27/2015 03/25/2015
Risk Management/Worker's Compensation Trust Fund Board
Gary Sherwood - Councilmember Sahuaro Appointment 01/27/2015 07/24/2017
Water Services Advisory Commission
Robin Berryhill Mayoral Appointment 01/27/2015 09/10/2015